+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died On Calendar
On June 12, 2020 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On June 2, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
- DR - TSDPAA: CA To MU
- DR - TSDPAA: MU To CA
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Municipalities;County Affairs
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency