+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Passed
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Banking and Financial Services
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Business and Financial Institutions
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2021: Passed (House)
February 4, 2021: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor