+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died On Calendar
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Moore, Clarke)
- Conference Report Failed
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Conferees Named Moore,Mayo,Guice
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Tollison,Collins,Carmichael
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Reconsidered
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Amended
- Failed
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Moore, Clarke)
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Education
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2013: Conference Report Failed (House)
March 13, 2013: Passed As Amended (House)
March 11, 2013: Failed (House)
February 12, 2013: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor