+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Amend From House
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Banking and Financial Services
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Business and Financial Institutions
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
February 12, 2013: Concurred in Amend From House (Senate)
February 7, 2013: Passed As Amended (House)
January 31, 2013: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor