+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Died On Calendar
- Tabled Subject To Call
- Set Aside-Pend Ruling of Chair
- Point of Order Raised
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Education
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
- Referred To Education
+ − Statutes Amended (21)
- 037-0151-0005 -
- 037-0057-0107 -
- 037-0009-0103 -
- 037-0013-0063 -
- 037-0013-0091 -
- 037-0015-0029 -
- 025-0011-0103 -
- 037-0165-0001 -
- 037-0165-0003 -
- 037-0165-0005 -
- 037-0165-0007 -
- 037-0165-0009 -
- 037-0165-0011 -
- 037-0165-0013 -
- 037-0165-0015 -
- 037-0165-0017 -
- 037-0165-0019 -
- 037-0165-0021 -
- 037-0165-0023 -
- 037-0165-0025 -
- 037-0165-0027 -
+ − Vote
January 16, 2013: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor