+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary A
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A