+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Universities and Colleges;Public Property
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Universities and Colleges
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
+ − Vote
February 13, 2014: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor