+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Universities and Colleges;Judiciary B
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Universities and Colleges
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 10, 2015: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor