+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Immediate Release
- Passed
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Passed
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations
+ − Votes (2)
January 30, 2020: Passed (House)
January 28, 2020: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor