+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Education
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 12, 2013: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor