+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Public Utilities
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy
+ − Statutes Amended (22)
- 077-0005-0203 -
- 077-0005-0205 -
- 077-0005-0207 -
- 077-0005-0209 -
- 077-0005-0211 -
- 077-0005-0215 -
- 077-0005-0217 -
- 077-0005-0219 -
- 077-0005-0221 -
- 077-0005-0223 -
- 077-0005-0225 -
- 077-0005-0229 -
- 077-0005-0231 -
- 077-0005-0233 -
- 077-0005-0235 -
- 077-0005-0239 -
- 077-0005-0241 -
- 077-0005-0243 -
- 077-0005-0247 -
- 077-0005-0249 -
- 077-0005-0253 -
- 077-0005-0255 -
+ − Vote
February 25, 2016: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor