+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died On Calendar
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
- Referred To Judiciary A
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDP: JA To PH
On January 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A;Public Health and Welfare
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2021: Passed As Amended (House)
February 4, 2021: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor