+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Transportation;Appropriations
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Highways and Transportation
+ − Vote
February 3, 2022: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor