+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Amend From House
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance