+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Amend From House
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Reconsidered
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Amended
- Passed As Amended
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Smith, Lamar)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
March 15, 2018: Concurred in Amend From House (Senate)
March 1, 2018: Passed As Amended (House)
February 8, 2018: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor