+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Universities and Colleges
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Universities and Colleges
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
February 22, 2018: Passed (House)
February 1, 2018: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor