+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Passed
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Public Health and Human Services
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDPCS: PH To AC
On January 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
+ − Statutes Amended (13)
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2014: Passed (House)
February 6, 2014: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor