+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Hopson,Doty,Frazier
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Conferees Named Baker,Beckett,Bennett
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary A
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2013: Conference Report Adopted (House)
April 2, 2013: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 5, 2013: Passed As Amended (House)
February 13, 2013: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor