+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Education
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
+ − Vote
January 31, 2018: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor