+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 26, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
March 24, 2017: Adopted (Senate)
March 22, 2017: Adopted (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor