+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Adopted
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On March 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On March 24, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2018: Adopted (Senate)
March 24, 2018: Adopted (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor