+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
- Referred To Rules