+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On July 1, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
On June 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Adopted
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 26, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Adopted As Amended
- Amended
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Adopted As Amended
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
June 30, 2020: Adopted (Senate)
June 26, 2020: Adopted As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor