+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2022: Adopted (Senate)
March 17, 2022: Adopted (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor