+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Rules