+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
- Referred To Rules
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
February 21, 2018: Adopted (Senate)
February 19, 2018: Adopted (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor