+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On June 18, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On June 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Adopted
On May 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
June 11, 2020: Adopted (Senate)
March 4, 2020: Adopted (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor