+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
February 10, 2017: Adopted (Senate)
February 3, 2017: Adopted (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor