+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Adopted
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
- Referred To Rules
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2021: Adopted (Senate)
March 10, 2021: Adopted (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor