+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2018: Adopted (Senate)
March 1, 2018: Adopted (House)
+ − Sponsors (118)
Type:
Primary Sponsor