+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Adopted
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
February 18, 2020: Adopted (Senate)
February 12, 2020: Adopted (House)
+ − Sponsors (119)
Type:
Primary Sponsor