+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Adopted
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
- Referred To Rules
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Brown (66th), DeLano, White, Holland)
- Adopted
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
- Referred To Constitution
+ − Votes (2)
January 14, 2015: Adopted (Senate)
January 13, 2015: Adopted (House)
+ − Sponsor
Snowden
Type:
Primary Sponsor