+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Rules