+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
March 2, 2015: Adopted (Senate)
February 23, 2015: Adopted (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor