+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
February 13, 2013: Adopted (Senate)
February 6, 2013: Adopted (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor