+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
January 29, 2015: Adopted (Senate)
January 23, 2015: Adopted (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor