+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
January 26, 2018: Adopted (Senate)
January 16, 2018: Adopted (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor