+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Adopted
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On January 8, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
February 15, 2021: Adopted (Senate)
January 8, 2021: Adopted (House)
+ − Sponsors (119)
Type:
Primary Sponsor