+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On March 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On March 29, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 28, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
March 31, 2015: Adopted (Senate)
March 29, 2015: Adopted (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor