+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 12, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 1, 2018: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor