+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 28, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred in Amend From Senate
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Young, Johnson, Massengill, Frierson)
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
- DR - TSDPCS: AP To TR
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- DR - TSDPCS: TR To AP
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Transportation;Appropriations
+ − Statutes Amended (19)
- 063-0013-0001 -
- 063-0013-0003 -
- 063-0013-0005 -
- 063-0013-0007 -
- 063-0013-0008 -
- 063-0013-0009 -
- 063-0013-0011 -
- 063-0013-0013 -
- 063-0013-0015 -
- 063-0013-0017 -
- 063-0013-0019 -
- 063-0013-0021 -
- 063-0013-0023 -
- 063-0013-0025 -
- 063-0013-0027 -
- 063-0013-0029 -
- 063-0001-0033 -
- 063-0007-0059 -
- 037-0041-0053 -