+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Concurred in Amend From Senate
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 17, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
March 16, 2022: Concurred in Amend From Senate (House)
March 8, 2022: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 9, 2022: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor