+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 27, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Branning,DeLano,Williams
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Conferees Named Busby,Massengill,McKnight
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Passed
- Amended
- Reconsidered
- Passed As Amended
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDPAA: HI To JA
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Highways and Transportation;Judiciary, Division A
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 17, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 29, 2022: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 27, 2022: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 9, 2022: Passed (Senate)
March 9, 2022: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 3, 2022: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor