+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider W/Drawn
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Currie, Turner, Crawford)
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Reconsidered
- Tabled Subject To Call
- Amended
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To S.C. Accountblty,Efficiency,Transparency
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 13, 2014: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor