+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Passed
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Education
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 1, 2016: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor