+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Reconsidered
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Faulkner, Turner, Foster)
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
+ − Statutes Amended (76)
- 043-0053-0001 -
- 043-0053-0003 -
- 043-0053-0005 -
- 043-0053-0007 -
- 043-0053-0009 -
- 043-0053-0011 -
- 099-0019-0073 -
- 045-0039-0001 -
- 045-0039-0003 -
- 045-0039-0005 -
- 045-0039-0013 -
- 045-0039-0007 -
- 045-0039-0009 -
- 045-0039-0011 -
- 049-0019-0401 -
- 049-0019-0403 -
- 049-0019-0405 -
- 049-0019-0408 -
- 049-0019-0001 -
- 049-0019-0003 -
- 049-0019-0407 -
- 039-0029-0001 -
- 041-0073-0001 -
- 041-0073-0003 -
- 041-0073-0005 -
- 041-0073-0007 -
- 041-0073-0009 -
- 041-0073-0011 -
- 041-0073-0013 -
- 041-0073-0015 -
- 041-0073-0017 -
- 041-0073-0019 -
- 041-0073-0021 -
- 041-0073-0023 -
- 041-0073-0025 -
- 041-0073-0027 -
- 041-0073-0029 -
- 041-0073-0031 -
- 041-0073-0033 -
- 041-0073-0035 -
- 041-0073-0037 -
- 041-0073-0039 -
- 041-0073-0041 -
- 041-0073-0043 -
- 041-0073-0045 -
- 041-0073-0049 -
- 041-0073-0051 -
- 041-0073-0053 -
- 041-0073-0055 -
- 041-0073-0057 -
- 041-0073-0059 -
- 041-0073-0061 -
- 041-0073-0063 -
- 041-0073-0065 -
- 041-0073-0067 -
- 041-0073-0069 -
- 041-0073-0071 -
- 041-0073-0073 -
- 041-0073-0075 -
- 007-0001-0403 -
- 007-0007-0002 -
- 041-0073-0047 -
- 041-0013-0025 -
- 065-0033-0027 -
- 065-0033-0029 -
- 065-0033-0031 -
- 065-0033-0033 -
- 057-0033-0001 -
- 057-0033-0003 -
- 041-0113-0009 -
- 041-0113-0003 -
- 041-0113-0007 -
- 041-0059-0007 -
- 041-0059-0005 -
- 083-0001-0201 -
- 083-0034-0005 -
+ − Vote
February 2, 2018: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor