+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 17, 2021 in the House:
- Law W/out Governor's Signature
On March 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Bryan,Parks,Frazier
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Conferees Named Mims,McGee,Currie
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Reconsidered
- Passed As Amended
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Health and Welfare
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Public Health and Human Services
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
March 26, 2021: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 26, 2021: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 10, 2021: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 3, 2021: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor