+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On June 18, 2020 in the House:
- Concurred in Amend From Senate
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On June 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On June 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Reconsidered
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Bomgar, Chism)
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Passed
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
June 18, 2020: Concurred in Amend From Senate (House)
June 15, 2020: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 11, 2020: Passed As Amended (House)
February 5, 2020: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor