+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died On Calendar
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Public Utilities