+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division B
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B